Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPECTOR-NARANJO v. U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02732
Date Filed2020-09-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCHIARA SPECTOR-NARANJO
Case DescriptionChiara Spector-Naranjo, an attorney who represented plaintiffs in a suit alleging securities fraud, submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning the investigation of Biscayne Capital International. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Spector-Naranjo filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency found that Exemption 7(A) was no longer applicable but indicated that a search for records would take some time. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Spector-Naranjo filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-241COMPLAINT against U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7635925) filed by CHIARA SPECTOR-NARANJO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2020.04.20 Acknowledgment Letter, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2020.04.29 FOIA Response, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2020.07.08 FOIA Decision, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 2020.09.09 FOIA Response, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Leimkuhler, Mark) Modified party filed against on 9/25/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-25Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-252SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-263STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/26/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/26/2020)
2020-10-084NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Dean Solonsky on behalf of U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Solonsky, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 9/30/2020 (Leimkuhler, Mark) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General October 1, 2020. (Leimkuhler, Mark) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/31/2020. (Leimkuhler, Mark) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar