Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNORRIS v. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02737
Date Filed2020-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJACK K. NORRIS, III
Case DescriptionJack Norris submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records concerning testimony by Army Capt. Jack Kummer to identify a sample of Norris' handwriting. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Norris filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-251ENTERED IN ERROR.....COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7638462) filed by JACK K. NORRIS, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Summons)(Maher, John) Modified on 9/25/2020 (zsb). (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-252COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by JACK K. NORRIS, III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Summons)(Maher, John) Modified on 9/25/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-25Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-25SUMMONS Not Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF ARMY, US Attorney, and US Attorney General.....INCORRECT SUMMONSES FILED. (zsb) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-253ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JACK K. NORRIS, III. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Maher, John) Modified on 9/30/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-30NOTICE OF ERROR re 3 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to johnmaher@maherlegalservices.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect summonses; Resubmit with correct FOIA summonses. (znmw, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-11-094REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JACK K. NORRIS, III. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Maher, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-105SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar