Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGANDHI v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02739
Date Filed2020-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffASHVIN DHIREN GANDHI
Case DescriptionAshvin Dhiren Gandhi submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for payroll based journal database records collected by the agency for FY 2020, quarter 2, including the data and variables employed by CMS in constructing this database. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Gandhi that processing of the request would take between 60 and 120 days. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gandhi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-251COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7639992) filed by ASHVIN DHIREN GANDHI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-25Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-273STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 27, 2020. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar