Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02746
Date Filed2020-09-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wildhorse Freedom Federation submitted a FOIA request to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning veterinary health certificates issued for export of immediate slaughter horses from the United States to Mexico issued from January 2016 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told WFF that the request was being referred to field offices for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-261COMPLAINT against ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7642700) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons summons x 3)(Stotter, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/30/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 09/26/2020)
2020-09-28Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmc) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-282SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-283STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/28/2020. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar