Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRUDOMETKIN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02687
Date Filed2020-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDAVID J. RUDOMETKIN
DefendantCHARLES N. PEDE Lieutenant General, in his capacity as the U.S. Army Judge Advocate General
TERMINATED: 09/24/2020
DefendantRYAN MCCARTHY in his capacity as the Secretary of the Army
TERMINATED: 09/24/2020
DefendantJAMES E. MCPHERSON in his capacity as General Counsel to the Secretary of the Department of the Army
TERMINATED: 09/24/2020
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-15Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/15/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-151COMPLAINT against RYAN MCCARTHY, JAMES E. MCPHERSON, CHARLES N. PEDE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (zmd) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-152MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN (zmd) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-153PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN. (zmd) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-244ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $15.00 from Prison Account of DAVID RUDOMETKIN and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2020. (zsb) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-245ORDERED that CHARLES N. PEDE (Lieutenant General, in his capacity as the U.S. Army Judge Advocate General), RYAN MCCARTHY (in his capacity as the Secretary of the Army) and JAMES E. MCPHERSON (in his capacity as General Counsel to the Secretary of the Department of the Army) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as party defendants. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2020. (zsb) (zsb). (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-25Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-10-226SUMMONS (2) Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service. (zsb) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-267ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN, U.S. DISCIPLINARY BARRACKS, 1300 N. Warehouse Road, Fort Leavenworth, KS 66027 (See order for further details).Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/26/2020. (DJS) (ztb). (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-11-17Partial Filing Fee Received from DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN in the amount of $25.00, receipt number: 4616104583. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar