Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGANDLUR v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02762
Date Filed2020-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffSHREYAS GANDLUR
Case DescriptionShrey Gandlur submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between the FBI and the New York City police department pertaining to arrests of protesters associated with anti-Fascist sentiments. Gandlur also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Gandlur's request for expedited processing. Gandlur filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expedited processing. The agency then told Gandlur that it found no responsive records. Gandlur filed an administrative appeal of the no records decision, attaching several media accounts concerning such communications. The FBI affirmed its original response. Gandlur then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-281COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7648026) filed by SHREYAS GANDLUR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-K, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-282NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of SHREYAS GANDLUR (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-283NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of SHREYAS GANDLUR (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-29Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-294SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-10-085STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/08/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar