Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLawyers for Civil Rights v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2020cv11777
Date Filed2020-09-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Douglas P. Woodlock
PlaintiffLawyers for Civil Rights
Case DescriptionLawyers for Civil Rights submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the agency's interpretation of the public charge provision in the Immigration and Nationality Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told LCR that its request was currently number 480 in a queue of 1459 pending requests. LCR then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-291COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8439274 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lawyers for Civil Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Draft Regulation, # 2 Exhibit B - FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit C - Automatic Reply, # 4 Exhibit D - Acknowledgment Email, # 5 Exhibit E - Emails, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Category Form)(Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-292ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-293Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-304NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Sampson on behalf of Lawyers for Civil Rights (Sampson, Lauren) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-025NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa I. Delinks on behalf of Lawyers for Civil Rights (Delinks, Marissa) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar