Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIngrid V. Eagly v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2020cv08968
Date Filed2020-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Fernando M. Olguin
PlaintiffIngrid V Eagly
Case DescriptionIngrid Eagly, a law professor at UCLA Law School, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning policies governing the Institutional Hearing Program. Eagly submitted a second FOIA request to BOP for records on implementation of immigration enforcement through BOP. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told Eagly that it was working on processing her requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Eagly filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Prisons
DefendantUS Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-301COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28315457 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Ingrid V Eagly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit) (Attorney Allen Yueh-Wen Tsai added to party Ingrid V Eagly(pty:pla))(Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-302CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly. (Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-303NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-304NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-305NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-306NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Emma Winger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-307NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Claudia Valenzuela. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-018First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emma C.Winger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28336910) filed by Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-019NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly. correcting First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emma C.Winger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28336910) 8 (Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-0110Amendment to First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emma C.Winger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28336910) 8 filed by Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-0111Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix face of the complaint)(Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-0112Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix face of the complaint)(Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-0213[REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR 15 ] 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant Federal Bureau Of Prisons. (iv) Modified on 10/2/2020 (iv). (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0214[REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR 15 ] 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant US Department of Justice. (iv) Modified on 10/2/2020 (iv). (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0215NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Re: Summons Issued 13 , Summons Issued 14 . Due to clerical error, summons issued incorrectly as case was filed under the Freedom of Information Act.Freedom of Information act cases require a 30 Day summons request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0216NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically AMENDMENT (Motion related) 10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). Incorrect event selected: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests.. Application.. Appear Pro Hac Vice. Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or changes sought.. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0217Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emma C.Winger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/1/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-28336910) filed by Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing) (Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0718APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Claudia B.Valenzuela to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28421820) filed by Plaintffs Ingrid V Eagly. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix) (Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-0919Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Notice of Clerical Error (G-11), 15 filed by plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix face of the complaint)(Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-0920Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Notice of Clerical Error (G-11), 15 filed by Plaintiff Ingrid V Eagly. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix face of the complaint)(Tsai, Allen) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-092130 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant Federal Bureau Of Prisons. (iv) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-092230 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant US Department of Justice. (iv) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-1623TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar