Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRyan LLC v. US Department of the Interior et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2020cv03014
Date Filed2020-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn
PlaintiffRyan LLC
Case DescriptionRyan LLC, an accounting firm that provided services for oil-industry clients, filed a reverse-FOIA against the Department of Interior after being notified that the Inspector General's Office had received a FOIA request for records that included potentially confidential information provided by Ryan.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Reverse-FOIA - Confidential business information, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of the Interior
DefendantOffice of Inspector General of the US Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-151COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24930772) filed by Ryan, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dumesnil, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-152Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. Department of the Interior, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Dumesnil, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-153Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. Department of the Interior, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Dumesnil, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-154Request for Issuance of Summons as to Office of Inspector General of the U.S. Department of the Interior, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Dumesnil, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-155Request for Issuance of Summons as to Office of Inspector General of the U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Interior, Asst. Attorney General for Administration - U.S. Dept. of Justice - Justice Management Div., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Dumesnil, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-156Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ryan, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matt Travis, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Dumesnil, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-167ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-168Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Complaint)(ChristopherSarrat, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-169NOTICE of Withdrawal of Docket No. 6 re: 6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ryan, LLC, filed. (Dumesnil, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-2810CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-2811NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Collins on behalf of Ryan, LLC, filed. (Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-09-0812MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Office of Inspector General of the U.S. Department of the Interior, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Karpati, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-2813Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division by Ryan, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue)(Dumesnil, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-3014ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division; Granting 13 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-30Interdistrict transfer to ND/TX - Dallas Div. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 9/30/20, filed. (sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/1/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-3015Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-02488. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-09-3016New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-0217ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/23/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/2/2020) (mla) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-0618NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn Whalen Theiss-DOJ on behalf of Office of Inspector General of the US Department of the Interior, US Department of the Interior. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Theiss-DOJ, Dawn) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-0719ORDER: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set via videoconference for 10/14/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/7/2020) (axm) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-0720Amended Notice of Appearance and Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. (Theiss-DOJ, Dawn) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-1421ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn: The Court held a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The parties each gave a brief statement of the case and agreed that they would confer and file a Scheduling Order. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff: Kevin Cooper; Defendant: Dawn Theiss. (Court Reporter: Debbie Kreigshauser). Time in Court - 0:13. (chmb) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-1422ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by Office of Inspector General of the US Department of the Interior, US Department of the Interior. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Theiss-DOJ, Dawn) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-1423CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Office of Inspector General of the US Department of the Interior, US Department of the Interior. (Theiss-DOJ, Dawn) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar