Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePeterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna v. United States Coast Guard
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv01451
Date Filed2020-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. Mary Alice Theiler
PlaintiffPeterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Peterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna, representing a client, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Coast Guard for records concerning a call for rescue at the Port Bridge. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told the law firm that it had located 86 potentially responsive pages. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Coast Guard
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-301COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Coast Guard (Receipt # AWAWDC-6633420) Attorney Michael Simon Wampold added to party Peterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna(pty:pla), filed by Peterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna. (Attachments: # SEALED (1) Exhibit)(Wampold, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2020. Exhibit sealed as it contains personal identifiers. (ST). (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-01Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (ST) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-01NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/8/2020. (ST) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-01NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Complaint. The exhibit contains personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (ST) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-012NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-023NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tomas A Gahan on behalf of Plaintiff Peterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna. (Gahan, Tomas) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-024REDACTION to 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Peterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gahan, Tomas) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-025CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Peterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna. (Gahan, Tomas) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-076CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Peterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna (Gahan, Tomas) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-127PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Peterson Wampold Rosato Feldman Luna (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons)(Gahan, Tomas) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-168Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States Coast Guard (KMP) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar