Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02787
Date Filed2020-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Treasury for records concerning IRS resumes, ethics forms, and communications. American Oversight also submitted FOIA requests to Treasury for records concerning communications with the White House as well as communications with the IRS. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-011COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7661417) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons USAO, # 10 Summons USAG, # 11 Summons Treasury, # 12 Summons IRS)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-01Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-013SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-084STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/08/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/8/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/7/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/08/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 10/7/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 10/8/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah Wishingrad)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar