Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALFORD v WILKIE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02805
Date Filed2020-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffLEROY ALFORD
Case DescriptionLeroy Alford filed suit against the Department of Veterans Affairs for maintaining inaccurate records concerning his Counseling/Evaluation/Rehabilitation file. Alford's cause of action is under the Privacy Act rather than FOIA.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantROBERT WILKIE Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-011COMPLAINT against ROBERT WILKIE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616104) filed by LEROY ALFORD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf) (Entered: 10/04/2020)
2020-10-01SUMMONS Not Issued as to ROBERT WILKIE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General (zjf) (Entered: 10/04/2020)
2020-10-052GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/5/2020. (jag) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar