Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02810
Date Filed2020-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the participation of U.S. Postal Inspection Service staff in a DOJ voter fraud task force. PDP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told PDP that it fell under the unusual circumstances exception and that it would take more time to process. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-021COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7669695) filed by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 6 Summons to United States Department of Justice, # 7 Summons to United States Attorney General)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc. (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-053MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David S. Frankel, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7674403. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of David S. Frankel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-054MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Harry P. Morgenthau, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7674495. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Harry P. Morgenthau, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-055MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel I. Sugarman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7674553. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Daniel I. Sugarman, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-05Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-05MINUTE ORDER denying 3 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 5.1(c)(1) ("All documents signed by an attorney shall contain the name, address, telephone number, and D.C. Bar identification number of the attorney if the attorney is a member of the D.C. Bar."). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/5/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-05MINUTE ORDER denying 4 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 5.1(c)(1) ("All documents signed by an attorney shall contain the name, address, telephone number, and D.C. Bar identification number of the attorney if the attorney is a member of the D.C. Bar."). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/5/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-05MINUTE ORDER denying 5 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 5.1(c)(1) ("All documents signed by an attorney shall contain the name, address, telephone number, and D.C. Bar identification number of the attorney if the attorney is a member of the D.C. Bar."). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/5/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-066SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-06MINUTE ORDER. On October 6, 2020, Chambers received a voicemail message from Plaintiff's counsel regarding 3 , 4 , 5 motions for appearance pro hac vice. To avoid ex parte communications, the Court prohibits telephone calls from parties. Plaintiff's counsel is further reminded that, pursuant to the Local Civil Rules, "[a]ll documents signed by an attorney shall contain the... D.C. Bar identification number of the attorney if the attorney is a member of the D.C. Bar." L. Civ. R. 5.1(c)(1); see also L. Civ. R. 11.1 ("All papers signed by an attorney shall contain the... bar identification number of the attorney."). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/6/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-077MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David S. Frankel, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7684738. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David S. Frankel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-078MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Harry P. Morgenthau, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7684800. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Harry P. Morgenthau, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-079MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel I. Sugarman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7684886. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Daniel I. Sugarman, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-0710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/7/2020 (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-0711RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/7/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/6/2020. (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-0712RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/07/2020. (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-0813STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/08/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-08MINUTE ORDER granting 7 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. David S. Frankel is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/8/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-08MINUTE ORDER granting 8 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Harry P. Morgenthau is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/8/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-08MINUTE ORDER granting 9 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Daniel I. Sugarman is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/8/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-0914NOTICE of Appearance by David Stanley Frankel on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Frankel, David) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-0915NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Pattridge Morgenthau on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Morgenthau, Harry) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-0916MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration LAURENCE M. SCHWARTZTOL, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit Index, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-12MINUTE ORDER. In view of 16 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, plaintiffs are HEREBY DIRECTED to contact forthwith the United States Attorneys Office for the District of Columbia and/or the Department of Justice as appropriate to identify government counsel. The parties shall thereafter file a joint status report by no later than October 14, 2020 at 12:00 PM NOON with recommendations for further proceedings, including, inter alia, (1) whether plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction should be consolidated with the merits under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65; and (2) recommendations for further proceedings including, if necessary, a briefing schedule for plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/12/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due no later than 12:00PM on 10/14/2020 (mac) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1317NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel I Sugarman on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Sugarman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1418NOTICE of Appearance by Indraneel Sur on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sur, Indraneel) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-1419Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant To Minute Order by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sur, Indraneel) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-14MINUTE ORDER. In view of 19 joint status report, the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendant shall file its response by no later than October 20, 2020. Plaintiff shall file its reply by no later than October 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/14/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response due by 10/20/2020. Plaintiff Reply due by 10/29/2020. (mac) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-1620CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Morgenthau, Harry) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar