Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. v UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02850
Date Filed2020-10-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffIMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC.
doing business as INVEST IN THE USA ("IIUSA")
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURIT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-061COMPLAINT filed by IMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet )(Grau, Aaron) Modified on 10/9/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/9/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-07Payment for 1 Cover Sheet. ($400; Receipt number ADCDC-7687376). (Grau, Aaron) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-09Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-09SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US Attorney, and US Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-112ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by IMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grau, Aaron) Modified on 10/13/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 10/11/2020)
2020-10-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to aaron@grauandassociates.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please complete and submit a summons form the the Court to issue. (ztd, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-153REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by IMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Grau, Aaron) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-164SUMMONS (2) Reissued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (ztd) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar