Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLattin v. The Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityAlbuquerque
Case Number1:2020cv01030
Date Filed2020-10-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal
PlaintiffJamie C. Lattin
Case DescriptionJamie Lattin submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning an investigation of a targeted threat against Aztec High School that was closed in March 2016. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied the request entirely under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Lattin filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy. OIP acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lattin filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantThe Federal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-071COMPLAINT Complaint for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(B), the Freedom Information Act against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jamie Lattin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robles, Luis) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-07Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number BNMDC-7346958 re 1 Complaint, filed by Jamie Lattin (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Robles, Luis) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-08United States District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and United States Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin assigned. (arp) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-14Summons Issued as to The Federal Bureau of Investigation. (arp) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar