Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBligen v. Navient
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2020cv03070
Date Filed2020-10-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge A. Joe Fish
PlaintiffDejan Bligen
Case DescriptionDejan Bligan filed suit against Navient, asking for records about a credit dispute. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantNavient
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-071New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-072Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmg) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-073COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Navient filed by Dejan Bligen. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmg) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-074MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dejan Bligen. (jmg) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-08***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Oct 8 08:39:52 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-095ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONS or take any further action pending judicial screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/9/2020) (oyh) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-09***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Oct 9 13:49:44 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar