Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRSM US LLP v. Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services,
DistrictSouthern District of Iowa
CityCentral
Case Number4:2020cv00315
Date Filed2020-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge John A. Jarvey
PlaintiffRSM US LLP
Case DescriptionRSM US LLP, an Iowa partnership, submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning the liquidation of CoOportunity. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told RSM US LLP that it was withholding all responsive records under Exemption 5 (privileges). RSM US LLP filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency subsequently disclosed a handful of records. After hearing nothing further from the agency, RSM US LLP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCenters for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-121COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4270600., filed by RSM US LLP. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/10/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/10/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Richards, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-132Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 10/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (don) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-303Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by RSM US LLP. (Richards, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar