Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Small Business League v. United States Office of Management and Budget et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2020cv07126
Date Filed2020-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffAmerican Small Business League
Case DescriptionThe American Small Business League submitted FOIA requests to the Office of Management and Budget and the U.S. Small Business Administration. The ASBL's request to OMB asked for records concerning the federal acquisition budget for FY 2017 through FY 2019. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but subsequently told ASBL that it had no records responsive to the request. ASBL filed an administrative appeal. ASBL's request to SBA asked for records concerning the identifies of various staff members and communications pertaining to calls to or from Press Office Director Terry Sutherland. ASBL also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency rejected ASBL's request for a fee waiver and told it instead that processing the request would cost $12,584. The ASBL filed an administrative appeal of the fee waiver denial. After hearing nothing further from either agency, ASBL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUnited States Office of Management and Budget
DefendantUnited States Small Business Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15058286.). Filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-132Proposed Summons. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-143Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-144Summons Issued as to United States Office of Management and Budget, United States Small Business Administration. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-145Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-206AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act (5 U.S.C. §) Civil Cover Sheet, Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; USDC ECF Registration Information; and Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial served on The United States Small Business Administration on 10/15/2020, filed by American Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 10/20/2020) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-277CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Small Business League.. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-098AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act (5 U.S.C. §); Civil Cover Sheet, Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; USDC ECF Registration Information; and Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial served on United States Office of Management and Budget on 11/2/2020, filed by American Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 11/9/2020) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar