Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02927
Date Filed2020-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Postal Service for records concerning ethics agreements and guidance pertaining to Postmaster Paul DeJoy. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told CREW it had found 11 responsive pages but was withholding them all under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). CREW filed an administrative appeal of the denial. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [21]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-131COMPLAINT against U.S. POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7705546) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons USPS)(Sus, Nikhel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/22/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-13Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/22/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/21/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE served on 10/22/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/22/20. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-11-305Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-306ORDER granting 5 defendant's consent motion for leave to late-file its answer. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/30/2020. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-017ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE.(ztd) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2021-01-048PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-069SCHEDULING ORDER: See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/6/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 3/1/2021. Response to Cross Motion due by 3/15/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 3/29/2021. Summary Judgment motion due by 1/29/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/1/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/15/2021. (tb) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-2810Consent MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-02-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the consent motion to modify the briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties' proposed briefing scheduled is adopted as follows: defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than February 3, 2021; plaintiff's combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion shall be filed by not later than March 4, 2021; defendant's combined opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion and reply shall be filed by not later than March 18, 2021; and plaintiff's reply shall be filed by not later than April 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/1/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 3/4/2021. Response to Cross Motion due by 3/18/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 4/1/2021. Summary Judgment motion due by 2/3/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/4/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/18/2021. (tb) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-0311MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Janine Castorina, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Postal Service Vaughn Index, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-03-0412Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-0413Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (duplicate of Dkt. No. 12-1) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-1614Consent MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-03-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the consent motion to modify the briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties' proposed briefing schedule is adopted as follows: defendant's combined opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion and reply shall be filed by not later than March 25, 2021; and plaintiff's reply shall be filed by not later than April 8, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/16/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-03-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motion due by 3/25/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 4/8/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/25/2021. (tb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-2415Consent MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-03-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the consent motion to modify the briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that the parties' proposed briefing schedule is adopted as follows: defendant's combined opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion and reply shall be filed by not later than April 5, 2021, and plaintiff's reply shall be filed by not later than April 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/24/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-03-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motion due by 4/5/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 4/19/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/5/2021. (tb) (Entered: 03/25/2021)
2021-04-0516REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jessica Brewster-Johnson, # 2 Statement of Facts (Response), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-0517Memorandum in opposition to re 12 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (duplicate of Dkt. No. 16) filed by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-1518REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 04/15/2021)
2021-07-0819NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of U.S. POSTAL SERVICE Substituting for attorney Kristin Brudy-Everett (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/08/2021)
2021-08-1720ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 11 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. See text of Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/17/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-1721MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/17/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2021. (tb) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-3022Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney's Fees by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 22 plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any motion for attorney's fees by not later than October 22, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/30/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for attorney's fees due by 10/22/2021. (tb) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-09-1523Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar