Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSwords to Plowshares et al v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv07146
Date Filed2020-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffSwords to Plowshares
PlaintiffNational Veterans Legal Services Program
Case DescriptionSwords to Plowshares and the National Veterans Legal Services Program submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning a proposed rule limiting veterans benefit eligibility to in service conduct and not considering extenuating circumstances. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency took a 10-day extension for its response. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the two organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-141COMPLAINT (FOIA Complaint and Prayer for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief) against U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15062446.). Filed bySwords to Plowshares, National Veterans Legal Services Program. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holloway, Julie) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-142Proposed Summons. (Holloway, Julie) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-143MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Claudia M. O'Brien ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15062635.) filed by National Veterans Legal Services Program, Swords to Plowshares. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(O'Brien, Claudia) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-144MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Alexander L. Stout ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15062664.) filed by National Veterans Legal Services Program, Swords to Plowshares. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stout, Alexander) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-145MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Zachary D. Williams ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15062705.) filed by National Veterans Legal Services Program, Swords to Plowshares. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Zachary) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-146MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brittany Sonia Bruns ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15062751.) filed by National Veterans Legal Services Program, Swords to Plowshares. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bruns, Brittany) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-147Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Veterans Legal Services Program, Swords to Plowshares and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Holloway, Julie) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-148Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-159Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-1510Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-1911SUMMONS Returned Executed by Swords to Plowshares, National Veterans Legal Services Program. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs served on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Holloway, Julie) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-1912CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Veterans Legal Services Program, Swords to Plowshares re 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Holloway, Julie) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-2313CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/6/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-2714CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Veterans Legal Services Program, Swords to Plowshares.. (Holloway, Julie) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-2715ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Claudia M. O'Brien. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-2716ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander L. Stout. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-2717ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Zachary D. Williams. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-2718ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brittany Sonia Bruns. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-1019STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-1020CLERK'S NOTICE . Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/24/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-1021ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 19 Stipulation Continuing Responsive Pleading Deadline. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-2422CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs.. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar