Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN v. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02949
Date Filed2020-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted two FOIA requests to the National Institute of Health. The first request was for records concerning the Accelerated COVID-19 Therapeutics Interventions and Vaccines (ACTIV) partnership. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The second request was for records concerning Operation Warp Speed. Public Citizen requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency asked Public Citizen to narrow the scope of its requests. Public Citizen did so but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-151COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7715739) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-15Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-153SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-11-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/5/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/5/2020. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/5/2020. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar