Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02950
Date Filed2020-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning communications between DOE and non-federal agency individuals referencing the 2019 North American Energy Resilience Model. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told CBD that it was processing the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-151COMPLAINT against CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7715915) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Corportate Disclosure Statement)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (zsb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-15Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-153STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 15, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-154SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-235NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-11-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/21/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/20/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/21/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 10/20/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Exhibit)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-187NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Borochoff-Porte on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Borochoff-Porte, Alison) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-208ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-23MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 23, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/7/2020 (zjch, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar