Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02960
Date Filed2020-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for records. The first FOIA request concerned the costs of developing a video entitled Protecting Our National Parks, Public Lands for Future Generations. CREW also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension. CREW's second request asked the National Park Service for records showing the cost of a fireworks display on the Washington Monument grounds on August 27 hosted by the Republican National Committee. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and later told CREW that it was processing responsive records. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7718060) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Interior)(Sus, Nikhel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/23/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-15Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/30/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/29/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 10/29/2020 (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar