Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSHTEYNSHLYUGER v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02982
Date Filed2020-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffALEX SHTEYNSHLYUGER M.D.
Case DescriptionAlex Schteynshlyuger, a doctor who wrote about health economics, submitted eight FOIA requests to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning a variety of topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. In response to one request, the agency withheld some records under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Schteynshlyuger filed an administrative appeal of that decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of his requests, Schteynshlyuger filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-161COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7722350) filed by ALEX SHTEYNSHLYUGER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-20, # 3 Exhibit 21-30, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-162NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of ALEX SHTEYNSHLYUGER (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-203SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-214STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/21/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar