Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKNOWLEDGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02986
Date Filed2020-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffKNOWLEDGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL
Case DescriptionKnowledge Ecology International submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services and the U.S. Army for records concerning development of vaccines for the corona virus. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. HHS withheld some records under Exemption 4 (confidential business records). KEI filed an administrative appeal of those withholdings. After hearing nothing further from either agency pertaining to its requests, KEI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Exemption 4 - Confidential business information, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
200 Independence Ave SW
Washington, DC 20201
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
114 Army
The Pentagon
Washington, DC 20310
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7723253) filed by KNOWLEDGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons HHS, # 3 Summons Army, # 4 Summons DOJ (Atty Gen), # 5 Summons DOJ (US Attorney))(Bernabei, Lynne) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/19/2020) (zmd). (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Knowledge Ecology International (Bernabei, Lynne) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-193GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/19/2020. (jag) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-194MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathryn Ardizzone, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7730455. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KNOWLEDGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernabei, Lynne) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-205SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-11-06MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Kathryn Ardizzone is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/6/2020. (jag) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-066NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Ardizzone on behalf of KNOWLEDGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL (Ardizzone, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-097NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KNOWLEDGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL. Attorney Lynne Ann Bernabei terminated. (Bernabei, Lynne) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-198AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY filed by KNOWLEDGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint Redline)(Ardizzone, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar