Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSIERRA CLUB v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Maine
CityPortland
Case Number2:2020cv00382
Date Filed2020-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJUDGE LANCE E. WALKER
PlaintiffSIERRA CLUB
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Energy for records concerning the application by the Central Maine Power Company to the agency for a Presidential Permit to construct and operate an electric transmission line across the United States border with Canada. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told the Sierra Club that it was processing the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Service of Process Deadline 1/14/2021) Fee due by 10/19/2020.(bfa) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-162CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-163Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-194CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Cassidy filed by SUSAN J. ELY on behalf of SIERRA CLUB (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2344397.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (ELY, SUSAN) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-20Filing Fee Received from SIERRA CLUB on October 19, 2020: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2344373. Method of Payment: Credit Card. (tcs) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-205NOTICE of Interested Parties by SIERRA CLUB (CASSIDY, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-11-04Case Reassigned to JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER due to a related case. JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR no longer assigned to the case. (mlm) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-086SUMMONS Return by SIERRA CLUB as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (CASSIDY, KEVIN) Modified on 11/9/2020 to change text from "Affidavit of Service" to "Summons Return" and to remove the served on date as unclear when the local US Attorney's Office was served (jgd). (Entered: 11/08/2020)
2020-11-127NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN SANER on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (SANER, KATELYN) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-128NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES D. CONCANNON on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (CONCANNON, JAMES) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-169AFFIDAVIT of Service by SIERRA CLUB. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 10/27/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service and Summons, # 2 Exhibit B - Return Receipts)(CASSIDY, KEVIN) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-16Set Answer Deadline for UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY: Answer due by 11/27/2020. (mlm) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-2410Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY Responses due by 12/15/2020. (SANER, KATELYN) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-2411ORDER granting 10 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to December 2, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar