Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02989
Date Filed2020-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted four FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the BLM Wild Horse and Burro Program RFI/SS Mare Sterilization Methods Market Research Questionnaire. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Wild Horse Campaign filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-171COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7725058) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/17/2020)
2020-10-19Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-203STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 20, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-11-244NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-245ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar