Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKENDRICK v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02900
Date Filed2020-10-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJAMES DEAN KENDRICK
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-08Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/08/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-081COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by JAMES DEAN KENDRICK. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-082MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES DEAN KENDRICK (zsb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-283PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 10/28/2020. (zsb) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar