Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02995
Date Filed2020-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning text messages sent to or from Andrew McCabe and Lisa Page, Jennifer Leonard, Peter Strzok, and/or Lisa Monaco. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request because it did not identify any agency records. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy. OIP remanded the request to the FBI for processing. The FBI told Judicial Watch that it had received the remanded request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7727800) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-20Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-224STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/22/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-315RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/30/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/29/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2020)
2020-10-316RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/30/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2020)
2020-10-317RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/30/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar