Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTADLI SOUABNI v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02999
Date Filed2020-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffEL HASSANE TADLI SOUABNI
Case DescriptionEl Hassane Tadli Souabni submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged request of the request. The agency disclosed 931 pages in their entirety and 39 pages in part. The agency withheld 432 pages entirely under Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records. Tadli filed an administrative appeal challenging the agency's withholdings. The agency disclosed 333 additional pages in full but continued to withhold 94 pages. Tadli then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-191COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7730104) filed by EL HASSANE TADLI SOUABNI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Mr. Souabni's FOIA Request Dated Oct. 16, 2019, # 2 Exhibit B, USCIS's Response to FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit C, Mr. Souabni's Administrative Appeal dated Feb. 26, 2020, # 4 Exhibit D, USCIS's Response to Administrative Appeal, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons for U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, # 7 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 8 Summons for the Acting U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Ragland, Thomas) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-20Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-223STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/22/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-11-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/16/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/16/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/23/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 10/22/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service for Michael Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service for Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service for USCIS)(Ragland, Thomas) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2021-01-065ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-07MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than February 8, 2021. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s), if any, for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/7/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 2/8/2021. (mac) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-02-086Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-09MINUTE ORDER. In view of 6 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by May 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/9/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/8/2021. (mac) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-127NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-128NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES Substituting for attorney Paul A. Mussenden (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-05-109Joint STATUS REPORT by EL HASSANE TADLI SOUABNI. (Ragland, Thomas) (Entered: 05/10/2021)
2021-05-11MINUTE ORDER. In view of 9 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another status report by no later than August 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/11/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-05-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/8/2021. (mac) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
2021-08-0610Joint STATUS REPORT by EL HASSANE TADLI SOUABNI. (Ragland, Thomas) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-06MINUTE ORDER. In view of 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than September 3, 2021, with a proposed schedule for further proceedings, if a stipulation of dismissal has not yet been filed by that date. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/6/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2021 (mac) (Entered: 08/08/2021)
2021-09-0311Joint STATUS REPORT by EL HASSANE TADLI SOUABNI. (Ragland, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-07MINUTE ORDER. In view of 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another joint status report by no later than October 4, 2021, advising the Court of the status of the parties' settlement discussion and proposing a schedule for further proceedings if a stipulation of dismissal has not yet been filed by that date. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/7/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/07/2021)
2021-09-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2021 (mac) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar