Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03003
Date Filed2020-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed sent a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning communications to or from Kim Hasenkrug and Ken Pekoc of the NIAID/RML Facility regarding the use of humanized mice in Hasenkrug's lab to study the corona virus reported by China to the World Health Organization. BuzzFeed amended its request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told BuzzFeed that it was processing the request but needed to receive confidential claims from one of the stakeholders. After hearing nothing further from the agency, BuzzFeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-191COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7730394) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-192NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-193LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-20Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-204STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/20/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-205SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-11-306ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceedings in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the report on or before December 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/30/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar