Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHoffman v. Congdon
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.3 Boise - Southern
Case Number1:2020cv00492
Date Filed2020-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David C. Nye
PlaintiffDavid Hoffman
DefendantDavid Congdon
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-191PETITION FOR FEE WAIVER by Plaintiff David Hoffman. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (kt) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-192MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff David Hoffman. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Argument in Support of Motion, # 2 Envelope)(kt) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-203ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
2020-12-024INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Hoffmans Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. 1 ) is GRANTED as stated herein. Hoffman need not prepay the fee in full;bhowever, Hoffman must pay $100.00 per month to the Clerk of Court, on or before the last day of each month, until the filing fee is paid in full. After an initial review of the Motion (Dkt. 2 ), the Motion is DENIED andHoffmans case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court GRANTS Hoffman leave to file a Complaint under a different legal theory should he choose to do so. Any Complaint must be filed within thirty (30) days of the issuance of this Order.. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar