Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityTrenton
Case Number3:2020cv14629
Date Filed2020-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson
PlaintiffSTATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case DescriptionThe New Jersey Attorney General's Office submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development and the Department of Justice for records concerning any factual basis for President Donald Trump's claims that a 2015 affordable housing rule caused an increase in crime. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, the New Jersey Office of the Attorney General filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11520199), filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAXENA, MAYUR) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-19Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-192SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-11-163SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Return of Service USAO, # 2 Declaration Return of Service USAG)(SAXENA, MAYUR) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-164SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Return of Service USAO, # 2 Affidavit Return of Service USAG)(SAXENA, MAYUR) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-12-025ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by All Defendants.(NEWMAN, LISA) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-076ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference, initiated by Plaintiff's counsel, set for 1/20/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 12/07/2020. (jem) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2021-01-137STATUS REPORT in lieu of joint discovery plan by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. (SAXENA, MAYUR) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-148TEXT ORDER: Please take notice that the rule 16 conference scheduled for 1/20/2021 at 2:00 p.m. is converted to a conference call with the Court for the same date and time. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/14/2021. (kas) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-20Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/20/2021 via Telephone Conference. (if, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-209TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference Call for 2/19/2021 at 11:30 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/20/2021. (if, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-02-19Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Telephone Conference held on 2/19/2021. (kas) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-1910TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff to file proposed consent scheduling order to the Court no later than 2/26/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/19/2021. (kas) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-2611Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. (SAXENA, MAYUR) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-03-0112JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/01/2021. (jem) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-0313NOTICE of Appearance by JOANNA RUTH LOOMIS on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL (LOOMIS, JOANNA) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-2214TEXT ORDER: Telephone status call is hereby scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/22/2021. (kas) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-05-13Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Telephone Conference held on 5/13/2021. (kas) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
2021-05-1315TEXT ORDER: Conference call is hereby scheduled for 7/15/2021 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 5/13/2021. (kas) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
2021-06-25Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. Magistrate Judge Z. N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. (jem) (Entered: 06/25/2021)
2021-07-0116TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman for 8/4/2021 at 9:30 a.m. The Court will provide counsel with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/1/2021. (ijf, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-08-04Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 8/4/2021. (ijf, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)
2021-08-0417TEXT ORDER directing counsel to file a stipulation and order of dismissal unless issues remain, in which case they are to file a status report by 9/30/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/4/2021. (ijf, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar