Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJohnston v. Wray
DistrictWestern District of Oklahoma
CityOklahoma City
Case Number5:2020cv01061
Date Filed2020-10-19
Date Closed2020-11-24
JudgeHonorable David L. Russell
PlaintiffAndrew Johnston
Case DescriptionAndrew Johnston submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning his investigation and conviction. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Johnston filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantChristopher Wray Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-191COMPLAINT against Christopher Wray filed by Andrew Johnston. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-192MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Johnston. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-213PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-214ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 10/21/20. (kmt) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-235REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- the undersigned recommends TRANSFER of this matter, including Plaintiff's pending Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2) to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona.This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 10/23/2020. (mc) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-23Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-11-246ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 5 Report and Recommendation, This matter is Transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 11/24/20. (jw) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-24Docket Annotation: Case has been sent to the District of Arizona at InterdistrictTransfer_AZD@azd.uscourts.gov. (kmt) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-24Docket Annotation: DETAILS: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in DISTRICT OF ARIZONA as case 4:20-cv-00520, filed 11/24/2020. (kmt) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar