Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03031
Date Filed2020-10-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted FOIA requests to the Bureau of Prisons, the Department of Justice and the Department of Health and Human Services for records. The request to BOP asked for records concerning communications discussing the risk of the corona virus to staff or prisoners at BOP facilities. The ACLU also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the ACLU's request for expedited processing. The agency directed the ACLU to its website for generic information and continued to process the request. The ACLU sent a request to the Department of Justice for records similar to those requested from BOP. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the ACLU's request for expedited processing. The agency told the ACLU that it was processing the request. The ACLU also sent a FOIA request to the Centers for Disease Control. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the ACLU's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from either agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantBUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantHEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-211COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7738212) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - BOP FOIA request, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - DOJ FOIA request, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - BJS FOIA request, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D - BJA FOIA request, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E - NCJRC FOIA request, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F - OJP FOIA request, # 7 Exhibit Ex. G - OLC FOIA request, # 8 Exhibit Ex. H - CDC FOIA request, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons BOP Summons, # 11 Summons DOJ Summons, # 12 Summons HHS Summons)(Hentoff, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-21Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-213NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas G. Gamse on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Gamse, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-214LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Gamse, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-215NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Sobel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sobel, David) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/22/2020) (zjf). (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-216MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ezekiel Edwards, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7741928. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gamse, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-217NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-278ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for ins tructions . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-179NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-1810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 10/26/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 10/26/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/26/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/26/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/25/2020.) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mailing)(Hentoff, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-1811NOTICE of Appearance by Suraj Kumar on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Kumar, Suraj) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-2012MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar