Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03033
Date Filed2020-10-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning communications involving EPA employee Jeffrey Sands, a former lobbyist for Syngenta, pertaining to triazine herbicides. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-211COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7739552) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons William Barr, Attorney General, # 3 Summons Environmental Protection Agency, # 4 Summons United States Attorney)(Evans, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Evans, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-21Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-11-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 10/29/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Delivery Confirmation)(Evans, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Delivery Confirmation)(Evans, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/30/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/29/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Delivery Confirmation)(Evans, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar