Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleByrne v. U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv07478
Date Filed2020-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffPeter Byrne
Case DescriptionPeter Byrne, a free-lance journalist, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control at the Department of Treasury for records concerning the sale of a stake in the Russian-owned oil company Roseneft to Qatar. Byrne also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency initially denied Byrne's fee waiver request but decided to include him in the news media category. However, the agency denied his request for expedited processing. Byrne filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Byrne filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control
DefendantU.S. Department of the Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-231COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. § 552 et seq. against U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15108051.). Filed byPeter Byrne. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-232Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-263Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/9/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-274Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-275Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-116CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Byrne.. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/11/2020) (Entered: 11/11/2020)
2020-11-167CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control.. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-258ANSWER to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2021-01-209ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-2010STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-2111ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 1/21/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-2212ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 10 Stipulation to continue initial case management conference and exempt case from initial disclosure requirements. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/8/2021 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. Joint case management conference statement due by 4/1/2021.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-03-3113STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re. Initial Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-04-0214ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 13 Stipulation to continue case management conference. Joint case management statement due by 5/20/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/27/2021 at 1:30 p.m. by videoconference. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-2715CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ZOOM. Due to the Court's upcoming trial schedule, the case management conference is continued to May 28, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Corley. The proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on May 27, 2021. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)
2021-05-1916STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
2021-05-2017ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 16 Stipulation to continue case management conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/8/2021 at 1:30 p.m. by Zoom videoconference. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021) (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-06-2918STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial CMC filed by U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/29/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
2021-06-2919ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 18 Stipulation to continue initial case management conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/26/2021 at 1:30 p.m. by videoconference.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
2021-08-1320STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Office of Foreign Assets Control. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-1621ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 20 Stipulation vacating case management conference. Next status report is due by 10/14/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar