Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVolovets v. Trump et al
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2020cv05082
Date Filed2020-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf
PlaintiffNaum I. Volovets
Case DescriptionNaum Volovets filed suit against President Donald Trump, Secretary of State Mike Pompeo and others for failing to disclose information about a treaty with Ukraine pertaining to investments. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantDonald J. Trump U.S. President
DefendantMike Pompeo Secretary of State
DefendantWilliam Barr U.S. Attorney General
DefendantKristina Kvien U.S. Amabassador to Ukraine
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-131COMPLAINT against William Barr, Kristina Kvien, Mike Pompeo, Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401268110)Document filed by Naum I. Volovets.(rdz) Modified on 10/16/2020 (sac). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.] (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-13Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.] (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-13Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.] (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-132PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Naum Volovets consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Naum I. Volovets. (rdz) Modified on 10/16/2020 (sac). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.] (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-13SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr, Kristina Kvien, Mike Pompeo, Donald J. Trump..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.] (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-154TRANSFER ORDER: Plaintiff has consented to electronic service of Court documents. (ECF 2.) The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This order closes this action. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/15/2020) (va) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.] (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-15CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (va) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/22/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-225Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-08504. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-226In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-11-097SUMMONS Returned Executed by Naum I. Volovets. Donald J. Trump served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Almonte, Giselle) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-098SUMMONS Returned Executed by Naum I. Volovets. Mike Pompeo served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Almonte, Giselle) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-099SUMMONS Returned Executed by Naum I. Volovets. William Barr served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Almonte, Giselle) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-2010Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Naum I. Volovets. (Almonte, Giselle) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-23Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Almonte, Giselle) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar