Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03071
Date Filed2020-10-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records. EPIC's first request was for communications and contracts pertaining to the use of Clearview's facial recognition technology. The second request asked for records concerning contracts with other facial recognition vendors. EPIC requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and asked EPIC to clarify its requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-261COMPLAINT against IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7756617) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General of the United States, # 3 Summons Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Scott, Jeramie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/6/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-263ERRATA correcting signature error on civil cover sheet by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER 1 Complaint, filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-26Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-264SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-265STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/26/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-11-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/30/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/29/2020. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 11/2/2020 (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/02/2020. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar