Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03088
Date Filed2020-10-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted two FOIA requests to the National Security Agency for records concerning requests for unmasking of Michael Flynn's identity by various Obama administration officials, including Joe Biden. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-271COMPLAINT against NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7762930) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 4 Summons for US Attorney General, # 5 Summons for National Security Agency)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-273NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01729-TJK. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-28Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-284NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Leigh Di Liberto on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-285SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-11-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/23/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/23/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY served on 11/20/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar