Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03095
Date Filed2020-10-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffADAM ENTOUS
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and New Yorker reporter Adam Entous submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the Havana Syndrome Report, prepared for the agency by the National Academy of Sciences pertaining to the investigation of acoustic noise that affected personnel at the U.S. Embassy in Cuba. JMP also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, JMP and Entous filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE Office of the Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7764258) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, Adam Entous. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons State, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-282LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADAM ENTOUS. (zmd) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-28Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-283STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/28/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-294SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-11-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/9/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/9/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/9/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-247MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by ADAM ENTOUS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - redlined FAC, # 3 Exhibit B - clean FAC, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-24MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 7 Motion for Leave to Amend. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket ECF 7-3 as Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint within 60 days after service of the Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/24/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar