Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03096
Date Filed2020-10-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT
Case DescriptionWhite Coat Waste Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning a study of post-operative recovery after cardiac surgery that had been done at the St. Louis Health Care System. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, White Coast Waste Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-271COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7764636) filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Request to Department of Veterans Affairs, # 3 Summons Request to US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Request to Civil Process Clerk)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-28Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar