Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03105
Date Filed2020-10-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
PlaintiffREBECCA HERSHER
PlaintiffJINGNAN HUO
Case DescriptionNPR reporter Rebecca Hersher and assistant producer Jingnan Huo submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning property sales records in the Single Family Acquired Asset Management System. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NPR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-281COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7768762) filed by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC., JINGNAN HUO, REBECCA HERSHER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons - U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office D.C.)(Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-29Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-11-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/5/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/5/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 11/4/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/5/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service (personal delivery to U.S. Attorney's Office - Civil Process Clerk), # 2 Certificate of Service (U.S. Attorney General), # 3 Certificate of Service (U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development)(Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-305NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-306ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-157GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 15, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-16MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions on or before January 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 16, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/15/2021 (hs) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-178Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the entry of a briefing schedule is deferred and, on or before January 29, 2021, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court on the status of the defendant's responses to the plaintiffs' Freedom of Information Act requests. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 28, 2020. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/29/2020 (hs) Modified on 12/28/2020 (hs). (Entered: 12/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar