Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBlack Alliance for Just Immigration et al v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP)
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2020cv05198
Date Filed2020-10-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carol Bagley Amon
PlaintiffBlack Alliance for Just Immigration
PlaintiffAmerican Immigration Council
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of San Diego & Imperial CountiesUnion
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Texasof
Case DescriptionThe Black Alliance for Just Immigration submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning CBP's involvement in domestic policing. BAJI also asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, BAJI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-281COMPLAINT against U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13598324 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Black Alliance for Just Immigration, American Civil Liberties Union of Texasof, American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego & Imperial CountiesUnion, American Immigration Council. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F) (Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-282MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13598458. by American Immigration Council. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of PHV motion, # 2 Letter of Good Standing) (Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-28Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-283In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-284This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-28ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/28/2020. (LK) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-295Proposed Summons. Re 1 Complaint,, by American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego & Imperial CountiesUnion, American Civil Liberties Union of Texasof, American Immigration Council, Black Alliance for Just Immigration (Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-296Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-11-187SUMMONS Returned Executed by Black Alliance for Just Immigration, American Civil Liberties Union of Texasof, American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego & Imperial CountiesUnion, American Immigration Council. U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) served on 11/5/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar