Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON et al v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03120
Date Filed2020-10-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
PlaintiffNATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD
PlaintiffPROJECT SOUTH
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, the National Immigration Project, and Project South submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning complaints and investigations pertaining to immigrants detained at the Irwin County Detention Center. CREW also asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The National Immigration Project and Project South also asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, CREW, the National Immigration, and Project South filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-291COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7772810) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, PROJECT SOUTH, NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons ICE)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-293ERRATA Civil Cover Sheet (corrected) by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD, PROJECT SOUTH. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-29Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-294SUMMONS(3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-295NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-306ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/30/2020. (DM) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-11-057MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Khaled Alrabe, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7802200. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mr. Khaled Alrabe)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-058MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Azadeh Shahsahani, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7802203. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROJECT SOUTH (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-059MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Priyanka Bhatt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7802204. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROJECT SOUTH (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-08ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for ins tructions . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 8, 2020. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/08/2020)
2020-11-08ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for ins tructions . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 8, 2020. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/08/2020)
2020-11-08ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for in structions . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 8, 2020. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/08/2020)
2020-11-1210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/3/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/3/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 11/2/2020 (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-1311NOTICE of Appearance by Khaled Alrabe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Alrabe, Khaled) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar