Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter for the Human Rights of Children v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv06449
Date Filed2020-10-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Ronald A. Guzman
PlaintiffCenter for the Human Rights of Children
PlaintiffAmerican Immigration Council
Case DescriptionThe Center for the Human Rights of Children submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the use of Title 42 to prohibit the entry of immigrants on the southern border because of the pandemic. CHRC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and subsequently told CHRC that its request would not incur fees. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CHRC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-291COMPLAINT filed by Center for the Human Rights of Children, American Immigration Council; No. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17594155. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-292ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Immigration Council, Center for the Human Rights of Children by Claudia Valenzuela (Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-30CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-11-02SUMMONS Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (exr, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-243AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Council, Center for the Human Rights of Children regarding Summons, Complaint, Exhibits served on DHS, CBP on 11/10/20; 11/16/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar