Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. et al v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03155
Date Filed2020-10-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffHUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.
PlaintiffHUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.
Case DescriptionHuawei Technologies submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Justice, the Department of State, the Department of Commerce, and the Department of Treasury for records concerning how U.S. China trade relations and the development of 5G technology may have influenced the U.S. decision to indict Huawei Chief Financial Officer Meng Wanzhou. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Huawei also requested expedited processing. Three of the agencies responded by withholding records under Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding), and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). After hearing nothing from U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Huawei filed an administrative appeal. ICE agreed to conduct a more expansive search. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Huawei filed suit.
Complaint issues: Expedited processing, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantOFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DefendantOFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL
US Department of Treasury
Treasury Annex
1500 Pennsylvania Ave.
washington, DC 2022
DefendantOFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Complaint attachment 34
Complaint attachment 35
Complaint attachment 36
Complaint attachment 37
Complaint attachment 38
Complaint attachment 39
Complaint attachment 40
Complaint attachment 41
Complaint attachment 42
Complaint attachment 43
Complaint attachment 44
Complaint attachment 45
Complaint attachment 46
Complaint attachment 47
Complaint attachment 48
Complaint attachment 49
Complaint attachment 50
Complaint attachment 51
Complaint attachment 52
Complaint attachment 53
Complaint attachment 54
Complaint attachment 55
Complaint attachment 56
Complaint attachment 57
Complaint attachment 58
Complaint attachment 59
Complaint attachment 60
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-301COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7781283) filed by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 45 Summons, # 46 Summons, # 47 Summons, # 48 Summons, # 49 Summons, # 50 Summons, # 51 Summons, # 52 Summons, # 53 Summons, # 54 Summons, # 55 Summons, # 56 Summons, # 57 Summons, # 58 Summons, # 59 Summons, # 60 Summons)(Smith, Corinne) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-302NOTICE of Appearance by Kwaku A. Akowuah on behalf of HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Akowuah, Kwaku) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-303LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Smith, Corinne) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-304MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Caitlin N. Matheny, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7781622. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Akowuah, Kwaku) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-305NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Hay on behalf of HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Hay, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-306MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian J. Fischer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7781638. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian J. Fischer in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Corinne) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-307NOTICE of Appearance by Frank R. Volpe on behalf of HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Volpe, Frank) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-308MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Olivia G. Hoffman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7781673. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Olivia G. Hoffman in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Corinne) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-309MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tessa J.G. Roberts, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7781680. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tessa J.G. Roberts in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Corinne) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-11-03Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-0410REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Smith, Corinne) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-0511SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-0512SUMMONS (16) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-12-0213Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,,,, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, James) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar