Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03159
Date Filed2020-10-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Federation submitted a FOIA request to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning APHIS veterinary services certificates title International Health Certificate for Horses for Permanent Entry (Reproduction or Work) Exported from the United States to Mexico. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and provided some records. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wild Horse Freedom Federation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-301COMPLAINT against ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7781501) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malone, Sean) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-11-03Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-033STANDARD ORDER in civil cases before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 3, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar