Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03165
Date Filed2020-10-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionThe Project on Government Accountability submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning the criteria the agency uses to determine and calculate the number of military personnel by geographic location recorded in the Defense Manpower Data Center. POGO also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency denied POGO's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, POGO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE DIRECTORATE FOR FREEDOM OF IMFORMATION AND SECURITY REVIEW
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-311COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE DIRECTORATE FOR FREEDOM OF IMFORMATION AND SECURITY REVIEW ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7782652) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Summons DOD, # 22 Summons USAG, # 23 Summons USAO)(Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 10/31/2020)
2020-11-02Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-022STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/2/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE DIRECTORATE FOR FREEDOM OF IMFORMATION AND SECURITY REVIEW, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar