Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNorthwest Employment Education and Defense Fund v. U.S. Department of Agriculture et al
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2020cv01871
Date Filed2020-10-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Marco A. Hernandez
PlaintiffNorthwest Employment Education and Defense Fund an Oregon nonprofit corporation
doing business as Northwest Workers' Justice Project
Case DescriptionThe Northwest Employment Education and Defense Fund submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Agriculture and the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning agency contracts with DL Reforestation, Inc. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, NEEDF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Agriculture agencies of the United States
DefendantU.S. Bureau of Land Management agencies of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-301Complaint. for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7436034 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Northwest Employment Education and Defense Fund dba Northwest Workers' Justice Project against Northwest Employment Education and Defense Fund dba Northwest Workers' Justice Project (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Prop Summ Atty Gen of US, # 3 Proposed Summons Prop Summ US Atty Gen Dist of OR, # 4 Proposed Summons Prop Summ BLM, # 5 Proposed Summons Prop Summ USDA). (Ledesma, Mayra) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-302Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 3/1/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/29/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/29/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-11-093Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of Agriculture. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: # 1 issued summons) (ecp) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar